studysite.org
        You must need it


New : Electrical Engineering
For premium access

 
Click Me For Another Topic
Home-> Vedic / Quicker Math-> Multiplication by 13

Vedic Math / Quicker Math / Math Tricks :-


MULTIPLICATION BY 13 :

To multiply any number by 13, we
"Treble each digit in turn and add its right neighbour".
This is the same as multiplying by 12 except that now we "treble" the
"number" before we add its "neighbour".
If we want to multiply 9483 by 13, we proceed like this :
Step I.
09483 X 13
9
(treble the right hand figure and write it down as there is no neighbour on the right)

Step II.
09483 X 13
79
(8 X 3 + 3 = 27, write down 7 arid carry over 2)

Step III.
09483 X 13
279
(4 X 3 + 8 + 2 = 22, write down 2 and carry over 2)

Step IV.
09483 X 13
3279
(9 X 3 + 4 + 2 = 33, write down 3 and carry over 3)

Last Step.
09483 X 13
123279
(0 X 3 + 9 + 3 = 12, write it down )

The answer is 1,23,279.


Practice Question Solve the following:

(1)35609 X 13 (2)11123009 X 13 (3)456789 X 13 (4)22200007 X 13

Ans : (1) 462917 (2) 144599117 (3) 5938257 (4) 288600091



Share new methods & leave your comments below...




NAME:          Email:

Click here to top