studysite.org
        You must need it


New : Electrical Engineering
For premium access

 
Click Me For Another Topic
Home-> Vedic / Quicker Math-> Multiplication by four-digit Number

Vedic Math / Quicker Math / Math Tricks :-


MULTIPLICATION BY FOUR DIGIT-NUMBERS :

Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 1234 x 5678 =?

Soln : (1) 1234 x 5678 = ?
Step I.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
        2
as (8x4 = 32, write down 2 and carry over 3)

Step II.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
     5 2
as (8x3 + 7x4 = 24 + 28 = 52 + 3 = 55, write down 5 and carry over 5)

Step III.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
   6 5 2
as (8x2 + 7x3 + 6x4 = 16 + 21 + 24 = 61 + 5 = 66, write down 6 and carry over 6)

Step IV.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
 6 6 5 2
as (8x1 + 7x2 + 6x3 + 5x4 = 8 + 14 + 18 + 20 = 60 + 6 = 66, write down 6 and carry over 6)

Step V.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
06652
as (7x1 + 6x2 + 5x3 = 7 + 12 + 15 = 34 + 6 = 40, write down 0 and carry over 4)

Step VI.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
006652
as (6x1 + 5x2 = 6 + 10 = 16 + 4 = 20, write down 0 and carry over 2)

Step VII.
1 2 3 4
5 6 7 8
7006652
as (5x1 + 2 = 7, write down 7 only)

So answer is 7006652.


Practice Question Solve the following:
(1) 5712 x 4334 (2) 5156 x 4278 (3) 3899 x 4388 (4) 5666 x 9255 (5) 8137 x 1983
ANSWERS :
(1) 24755808 (2) 22057368 (3) 17108812 (4) 52438830 (5) 16135671



Share new methods & leave your comments below...




NAME:          Email:

Click here to top