studysite.org
        You must need it


New : Electrical Engineering
For premium access

 
Click Me For Another Topic
Home-> Vedic / Quicker Math-> Multiplication by two-digit Number

Vedic Math / Quicker Math / Math Tricks :-


MULTIPLICATION BY THREE DIGIT-NUMBERS :

Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 321 x 132 = ? (2) 4562 x 345 = ? (3) 69712 x 641 = ?

Soln : (1) 321 x 132 = ?
Step I.
3   2   1
1   3   2
         2
as (1x2 = 2)

Step II.
3   2   1
1   3   2
      7   2
as (2x2+3x1 = 7)

Step III.
3   2   1
1   3   2
 3  7   2
as (2x3+3x2+1x1 = 13, write down 3 and carry over 1)

Step IV.
3   2   1
1   3   2
2 3 7 2
as (3x3+1x2+1 = 12, write down 2 and carry over 1)

Step V.
3   2   1
1   3   2
4 2 3 7 2
as (1x3+1 = 4)




Share new methods & leave your comments below...




NAME:          Email:

Mizba said on : 2016-08-16 04:49:25
didn't understand third step.

Ramandeep said on : 2015-08-31 14:56:06
Another method of understanding...

3digit multiplication will be done as follows. multiply 325*432

step-1: u*u= 2*5 = 10, write 0 at unit place. carry=1
step-2: u*t+t*u+1(ie.carry )=20, write 0 at ten place, carry=2
step-3: u*h+h*u+t*t+2(carry) =34, write 4 at hundred place, carry=3
step-4: t*h+h*t+3(carry) = 20 write, 0 at thousand place, carry=2
step-5: h*h+2(Carry ) =14 write 14 at ten thousand place.

ans= 140400

Click here to top and Click here to comment